ABINGER HAMMER VILLAGE SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 285317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.58k £4.38k £4.90k £5.01k £5.14k
Total expenditure £5.62k £5.13k £4.72k £4.87k £4.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A