Accounts and annual returns THE RIX-THOMPSON-ROTHENBERG FOUNDATION

Charity number: 285368
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window