Financial history 1ST COVE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 285393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £20.58k £14.32k £28.63k £24.78k £24.18k
Total expenditure £12.45k £15.52k £10.98k £22.41k £18.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A