Financial history THE STOLLER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 285415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £2.36m £1.32m £910.75k £694.31k £2.66m
Total expenditure £13.28m £921.60k £4.67m £5.21m £1.32m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £493.50k £404.60k £468.00k £0 £2.43m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.87m £917.62k £442.75k £694.31k £230.28k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.15m £806.41k £4.59m £5.14m £1.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £132.63k £115.19k £85.41k £73.83k £70.33k
Expenditure - Governance £74.51k £97.48k £116.65k £102.01k £89.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £13.07m £708.93k £4.47m £5.03m £1.16m
Expenditure - Investment management £132.63k £115.19k £85.41k £73.83k £70.33k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0