THE PADDOCK WOOD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 285551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 17 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required