THE PADDOCK WOOD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 285551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £7.03k £6.36k £4.63k £6.21k £5.72k
Total expenditure £6.09k £4.41k £5.51k £4.99k £1.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A