Financial history 11TH FOLKESTONE (ST JOHN'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 285558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £24.82k £48.76k £35.34k £43.26k £54.40k
Total expenditure £19.54k £32.95k £81.75k £37.52k £24.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £12.33k £22.70k