Accounts and annual returns THE FIREFLY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 285655
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 February 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required