Accounts and annual returns THE WILLIAM AND ELLEN VINTEN TRUST

Charity number: 285758
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 April 2020 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 April 2020 69 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window