Trustees THE WILLIAM AND ELLEN VINTEN TRUST

Charity number: 285758
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID YOUNGMAN Chair 24 September 2021
None on record
Steven Allan Kenchington Trustee 21 January 2022
None on record
Emma Louise DEVLIN Trustee 25 September 2020
None on record
Derek Andrew Langley Trustee 14 July 2017
None on record
Stephen Crosher Trustee 23 September 2016
None on record
KEITH HONEYMAN Trustee 04 November 2012
None on record
JAMES GUEST Trustee 29 October 2012
None on record
ROBIN HUGH CROSHER Trustee
None on record