BORDER LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 285815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.80k £3.89k £2.86k £2.95k £2.41k
Total expenditure £6.02k £1.59k £3.53k £3.26k £2.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A