Accounts and annual returns OATLANDS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 285873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window