Financial history OATLANDS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 285873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £31.51k £30.53k £31.96k £24.33k £15.33k
Total expenditure £33.04k £20.05k £22.82k £15.08k £34.92k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A