THE EXCELSIOR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acquiring, maintaining and restoring the Lowestoft Smack "Excelsior" LT472 and providing facilities for young people to sail thereby maintaining their maritime heritage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 02 February 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerald Skews | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alice-Ann Taylor | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DEREK HUNTER IRVING | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHRISTOPHER SPENCER WYLSON | Trustee | 03 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Oliver Campbell | Trustee | 19 August 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.63k | £114.83k | £114.83k | £93.84k | £176.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.52k | £110.14k | £110.14k | £34.97k | £232.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £3.17k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 05 October 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 05 October 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 18 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH OCTOBER 1982
Charitable objects
(A) TO ACQUIRE, RESTORE, RE-RIG AND MAINTAIN THE LOWESTOFT SMACK "EXCELSIOR", (EX "SVINOR", EX "EXCELSIOR" LT 472) USING AS FAR AS IS REASONABLY PRACTICAL, SIMILAR MATERIALS AND TECHNIQUES TO THOSE USED IN HER ORIGINAL CONSTRUCTION SO THAT SHE MAY BE PRESERVED AND OPENED TO INSPECTION BY THE PUBLIC AS PART OF BRITAIN'S MARITIME HERITAGE FOR FUTURE GENERATIONS AND FULFIL THE OTHER AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE TRUST. (B) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO SAIL, AN WORK AN HISTORIC VESSEL AT SEA THEREBY KEEPING ALIVE THEIR MARITIME HERITAGE. (C) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR DISABLED PEOPLE TO SAIL AT SEA AS FULL MEMBERS OF AN INTEGRATED TEAM ALONGSIDE THE ABLE BODIED, THEREBY INCULCATING A SENSE OF RESPONSIBILITY IN EACH AND EVERY MEMBER OF THE TEAM WHATEVER THEIR ABILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ventulus
Cross Lane
Brancaster
KING'S LYNN
PE31 8AE
- Phone:
- 01485 210756
- Email:
- jcamp93857@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window