DORCHESTER CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 285911
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 02 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 30 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 30 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 26 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 09 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 13 November 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)