DORCHESTER CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 285911
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 £300 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £27.90k £32.37k £32.70k £32.01k £25.39k
Total expenditure £22.13k £32.10k £32.36k £22.36k £31.58k