DORCHESTER CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 285911
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John David Huggins Trustee 03 November 2014 None on record
Giles Watts Trustee 01 November 2014 None on record
CHRISTINE PFAFF Trustee None on record
Kate Frances Beatt Trustee 03 November 2014 None on record
WILLIAM BERNARD CHARLES EVANS Trustee 23 September 2012 None on record
Valerie Ann Cheeseman Trustee 12 October 2015 None on record
ELIZABETH GRACE ADAMS Trustee 18 November 2011 None on record
Jane Elizabeth Howard Chair 29 October 2018
INTERNATIONAL NEEDS UK Charity reporting is up to date
CLAYESMORE SCHOOL Charity reporting is up to date
JANE PRYCE Trustee
DORCHESTER OPPORTUNITY PRESCHOOL GROUP LTD Charity reporting is up to date
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DORCHESTER AND WEST STAFFORD Charity reporting is up to date
Giles Francis Tanfield Watts Trustee 03 November 2014 None on record
Christopher Noel Patrick Tozer Trustee 03 November 2014 None on record
Kevin Rogers Trustee 06 October 2020 None on record