Accounts and annual returns STOCK EXCHANGE CLERKS FUND

Charity number: 286055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window