STOCK EXCHANGE CLERKS FUND

Charity number: 286055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £111.08k £109.60k £140.64k £142.85k £128.30k
Total expenditure £127.69k £125.95k £141.75k £167.12k £194.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A