Financial history HARROW BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 286086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £16.87k £9.58k £20.70k £9.95k £13.17k
Total expenditure £14.81k £11.53k £18.12k £9.93k £14.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A