Accounts and annual returns THE MARGARET FISHER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 286256
Charity reporting is overdue by 72 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 72 days
Accounts and TAR 16 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 72 days
Annual return 16 May 2020 16 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 16 May 2020 16 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 16 May 2019 13 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 16 May 2019 13 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 16 May 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 16 May 2018 05 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 16 May 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 16 May 2017 05 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window