Financial history THE MARGARET FISHER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 286256
Charity reporting is overdue by 64 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/05/2016 16/05/2017 16/05/2018 16/05/2019 16/05/2020
Total gross income £28.29k £36.79k £34.46k £36.72k £27.90k
Total expenditure £377.88k £71.59k £561.49k £236.75k £53.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A