Trustees LITTLE BRICKHILL COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST
Charity number: 286272

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENISE BUSHELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Diane Delaney | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Cooke | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Campbell | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Conn | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Lockhart | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Simpson | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
LUCY ELIZABETH CHENEY LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.