Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF PUTNEY HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 286279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 28 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 07 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window