Financial history FRIENDS OF PUTNEY HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 286279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £151.46k £61.12k £54.35k £48.52k £40.73k
Total expenditure £72.12k £121.71k £42.56k £13.35k £29.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A