Trustees FRIENDS OF PUTNEY HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 286279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

26 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Day Chair 23 September 2019
None on record
Leigh Curtis Green Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Tess Goldman Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
James Mutton Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Ruth Niven Hirst Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Sabine Russell Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Liz Leicester Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Natasha Caroline Wada Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Rachel Tanner Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Daria Boeva-Gaffikin Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Laura Smith Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Benazir Guha Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Angelina Harris Trustee 09 November 2020
None on record
Wendy Ward Trustee 28 September 2020
None on record
Elizabeth Hackett-Brown Trustee 28 September 2020
None on record
Helen Perrott Trustee 28 September 2020
None on record
Sharon Kaye Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
Joanne Butter Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record
Isobel Franks Trustee 09 October 2017
None on record
Andrew Miller Trustee 09 October 2017
None on record
Pippa Page-Roberts Trustee 09 October 2017
None on record
Vanessa Robert Trustee 22 January 2017
None on record
HEIDI ARMSTRONG Trustee 06 June 2016
None on record
Suzie LONGSTAFF Trustee 06 June 2016
None on record
ALICE MAUGHAN Trustee 10 October 2015
None on record
SUZANNE FEARON Trustee 03 September 2014
None on record