MAYVILLE HIGH SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 286347
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 July 2021 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 01 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 21 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 24 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 24 May 2017 On time Download