MAYVILLE HIGH SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 286347
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.26m £4.33m £4.43m £4.69m £4.73m
Total expenditure £4.27m £4.38m £4.45m £4.51m £4.65m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £153.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £37.24k £48.25k £53.33k £5.08k £6.05k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.22m £4.28m £4.38m £4.68m £4.56m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.79k £1.95k £2.35k £3.11k £4.41k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £153.89k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.27m £4.38m £4.45m £4.51m £4.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £18.61k £14.32k £17.07k £16.22k £51.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0