Financial history THE BRITISH NEUROPATHOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 286363
Charity reporting is overdue by 141 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £122.94k £126.47k £141.74k £139.45k £140.83k
Total expenditure £178.26k £136.79k £94.06k £160.63k £23.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A