Financial history WOMENS PLAYHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 286384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.00k £3.60k £15.38k £95.78k £63.52k
Total expenditure £193.36k £106.88k £133.75k £202.57k £86.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £6.75k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £6.75k N/A N/A