St Joseph's School Association (SJSA)

Charity number: 286432
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 09 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 22 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 February 2017 On time Download