Financial history St Joseph's School Association (SJSA)

Charity number: 286432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £134.79k £130.43k £133.95k £38.34k £34.62k
Total expenditure £185.75k £102.39k £99.64k £115.25k £44.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A