Financial history THE AMERSHAM FESTIVAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 286455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £54.56k £81.32k £35.74k £7.01k £47.46k
Total expenditure £68.18k £66.86k £54.36k £9.50k £58.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A