Trustees THE AMERSHAM FESTIVAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 286455

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary McCann | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas George Kirkbride | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jenkin | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Lesley Mathieson | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christine Susan Norton | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
GILL MINIKIN | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Dahl Pegler | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.