Financial history FRANK BARNES PARENT-SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 286556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.41k £1.41k £173 £6.46k £2.93k
Total expenditure £7.37k £12.01k £1.41k £6.45k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A