Financial history THE SOCIETY OF PRACTISING VETERINARY SURGEONS CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 286572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.90k £13.15k £5.81k £5.68k £3.79k
Total expenditure £17.93k £13.47k £1.78k £5.10k £1.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A