Trustees THE SOCIETY OF PRACTISING VETERINARY SURGEONS CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 286572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Catriona Curtis Chair 22 January 2015
THE PETS AT HOME FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Ryan Julian Thomas Davis Trustee 20 January 2022
None on record
Andrew Parker Trustee 23 January 2021
None on record
Nicholas Lloyd Trustee 23 January 2020
None on record
Susan Ann JENNINGS Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record