Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S WOOD CHURCH CRYPT CLUB

Charity number: 286612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required