Accounts and annual returns THE STRONG MAN LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 286686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 09 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 06 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 May 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 January 2021 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 11 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required