Financial history THE STRONG MAN LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 286686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £4.45k £4.48k £7.13k £8.09k £7.34k
Total expenditure £4.10k £2.85k £7.10k £2.45k £10.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A