Accounts and annual returns THE NATHAN-KARET CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 286708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 February 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required