THE MEAPA

Charity number: 286732
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2021 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 June 2021 358 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 July 2019 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 July 2019 15 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 July 2018 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 July 2018 31 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 04 July 2017 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 July 2017 4 days late Download