Accounts and annual returns THE DOROTHY HOLMAN YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 286751
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 105 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 November 2020 285 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 November 2020 650 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 July 2018 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required