BRADFIELD AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 286761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.66k £3.71k £4.55k £5.59k £5.06k
Total expenditure £3.34k £4.66k £4.84k £4.74k £5.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A