Financial history THE BRITISH MARITIME CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 286784
Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £58.88k £52.82k £71.79k £48.88k £30.75k
Total expenditure £51.99k £54.39k £63.00k £59.56k £51.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A