THE RAINBOW CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to those engaged in or studying for the Christian Ministry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 April 1983: Standard registration
- 22 February 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.05k | £29 | £8.62k | £4.44k | £433 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.00k | £12.00k | £10.00k | £1.50k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 20 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 25 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 07 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME AND CAPITAL TO SUCH CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window