Accounts and annual returns ELSIE AND BARNETT JANNER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 286860
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required