Accounts and annual returns WEST MIDDLESEX UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL POSTGRADUATE MEDICAL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 286896
Charity reporting is overdue by 1462 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 1 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 1 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 366 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 366 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 731 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 731 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1097 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1097 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1462 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1462 days