Financial history WEST MIDDLESEX UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL POSTGRADUATE MEDICAL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 286896
Charity reporting is overdue by 1822 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £42.04k £29.67k £48.95k £22.87k £35.17k
Total expenditure £69.17k £71.75k £73.96k £52.72k £44.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A