THE ST LAZARUS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raises and distributes funds for the relief of leprosy sufferers throughout the world. NOTE: The trustees meet twice a year, in April and October. The vast majority of grants are made at the October meeting. Unless you have received a grant from the Trust previously, ALL applications MUST be submitted on a Pro-Forma available from the Secretary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 April 1983: Standard registration
- 03 May 2017: Funds received from 1017486 COMMANDERY OF AVALON OF THE MILITARY AND HOSPITALL...
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER CHARLES HIRST | Chair | 28 October 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Timothy Patrick Abraham | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
PATRICK WILLIAM THOMAS WILKINS | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dr DAVID KNOX | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Ivar Andreas Robert John Grey | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
John Anthony Reid | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Charles John Paul Betz | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.21k | £71.97k | £112.92k | £111.05k | £86.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.76k | £103.03k | £88.74k | £116.05k | £103.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/03/1983 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/09/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/09/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/05/2001
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS THE RELIEF OF THE DISABLED AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR 1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LEPROSY (2) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED (3) THE RELIEF OF VICTIMS OF DISASTER AND WAR, (4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
The Glove Factory
Montacute Road
Tintinhull
Yeovil
BA22 8SL
- Phone:
- 01935826723
- Email:
- ewsecretary@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window